AL SB90 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Assigned Act No. 2016-314.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Assigned Act No. 2016-314.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Taxation, tax credit for employers employing apprentices, Apprenticeship Tax Credit Act
Title
Taxation, tax credit for employers employing apprentices, Apprenticeship Tax Credit Act
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 84 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2016-314. |
2016-05-03 | House | Signature Requested |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2016-04-28 | House | Mooney intended to vote "Yea" |
2016-04-28 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 799 |
2016-04-28 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-03-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Engrossed |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 164 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 163 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Orr Second Amendment Offered |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Orr motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Orr Amendment Offered |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Orr motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Orr Amendment Offered |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Orr motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |