AL SB9 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Assigned Act No. 2018-551.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Hunting, waterfowl stamps, lifetime stamps, cost adjustments under certain conditions, Sec. 9-11-433 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hunting, waterfowl stamps, lifetime stamps, cost adjustments under certain conditions, Sec. 9-11-433 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - Senate - Melson motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateAssigned Act No. 2018-551.
2018-03-28HouseSignature Requested
2018-03-28HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2018-03-28SenateEnrolled
2018-03-28SenateMelson motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1219
2018-03-27HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1067
2018-03-27HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1066
2018-03-27HouseIngram Amendment Offered
2018-03-27HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-03-28SenateConcurrence Requested
2018-03-22HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2018-03-15HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-03-08HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry
2018-03-08SenateEngrossed
2018-03-08SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 732
2018-03-08SenateMelson motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 731
2018-03-08SenateAgriculture, Conservation, and Forestry first Substitute Offered
2018-03-08SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-03-01SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2018-01-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB9&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB9-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB9-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/191292-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=594358&VOTE=731&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=594359&VOTE=732&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=601582&VOTE=1066&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=601616&VOTE=1067&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=602030&VOTE=1219&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback