AL SB88 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
FY24 Education Trust Fund - Governor's Rec.
Title
FY24 Education Trust Fund - Governor's Rec.
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-26 - Senate - Concur In and Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-26 - House - Concur In and Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - House - Accede (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - House - Adopt A8YI77-1 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - House - Adopt SK2988-1 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Adopt JZ7PYN-1 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-26 - House - Concur In and Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - House - Accede (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - House - Adopt A8YI77-1 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - House - Adopt SK2988-1 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Adopt JZ7PYN-1 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-26 | House | Enacted |
2023-05-26 | House | Concur In and Adopt |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Concur In and Adopt |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Amendment/Substitute by Senate Conference Committee on SB88 VIMYVV-1 |
2023-05-25 | House | Accede to Conference Committee on SB88 |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee |
2023-05-25 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended |
2023-05-25 | House | Adopt A8YI77-1 |
2023-05-25 | House | Adopt SK2988-1 |
2023-05-25 | House | On Third Reading in Second House |
2023-05-24 | House | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-05-24 | House | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-05-24 | House | Reported Favorably from House Ways and Means Education |
2023-05-24 | House | Amendment/Substitute by House Ways and Means Education SK2988-1 |
2023-05-09 | House | Referred to Committee to House Ways and Means Education |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Adopt JZ7PYN-1 |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Table XSY4Z7-1 |
2023-05-04 | Senate | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Finance and Taxation Education |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Amendment/Substitute by Senate Finance and Taxation Education XSY4Z7-1 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Senate Finance and Taxation Education |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Read First Time in House of Origin |