AL SB88 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - Pending third reading on day 9 Favorable from Ways and Means Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - Pending third reading on day 9 Favorable from Ways and Means Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Education, gifted or talented children, grants for educational programs provided by State Department of Education, local match required
Title
Education, gifted or talented children, grants for educational programs provided by State Department of Education, local match required
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | House | Pending third reading on day 9 Favorable from Ways and Means Education |
2017-03-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 88 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |