AL SB87 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Assigned Act No. 2017-355.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prisons and prisoners, Pardons and Paroles Bd., medical parole docket, eligibility for certain prisoners suffering from chronic life-threatening illnesses, Corrections Dept. to provide list for consideration

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prisons and prisoners, Pardons and Paroles Bd., medical parole docket, eligibility for certain prisoners suffering from chronic life-threatening illnesses, Corrections Dept. to provide list for consideration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - House - Beech motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 70 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - Beech motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 70 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Pittman motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - Beech motion to Accede (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Reed motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 86 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 65 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseAssigned Act No. 2017-355.
2017-05-19SenateConference Committee on SB87 2017RS first Substitute Offered
2017-05-19SenateConference Report
2017-05-19HouseConference Report Concurrence Requested
2017-05-19HouseSignature Requested
2017-05-19SenateEnrolled
2017-05-19HouseBeech motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1043
2017-05-19SenateConcurred in Conference Report
2017-05-19SenatePittman motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1327
2017-05-19SenateConference Committee Requested
2017-05-19HouseBeech motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 1029 House appoints Beech, Clouse and South
2017-05-19HouseConference Committee Requested
2017-05-19SenateReed motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 1286 P&PO appoints Pittman, Marsh and Singleton
2017-05-19SenateConcurrence Requested
2017-05-18HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 993
2017-05-18HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 992
2017-05-18HouseHolmes (M) Amendment Offered
2017-05-18HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 991
2017-05-18HouseWays and Means General Fund Amendment Offered
2017-05-18HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-04-06HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2017-03-15HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
2017-03-15SenateEngrossed
2017-03-14SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 308
2017-03-14SenatePittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 307
2017-03-14SenateFinance and Taxation General Fund first Substitute Offered
2017-03-14SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-03-09SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2017-02-07SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB87&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/SB87-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/SB87-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/SB87-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/183672-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/184616-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/186972-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/187242-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=563981&VOTE=307&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=563982&VOTE=308&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=578578&VOTE=991&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=578582&VOTE=992&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=578583&VOTE=993&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=578945&VOTE=1286&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=579081&VOTE=1029&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=579322&VOTE=1327&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=579482&VOTE=1043&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=579558&VOTE=1043&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback