AL SB86 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Alabama Road and Bridge Rehabilitation and Improvement Authority established to finance road and bridge improvements, authority to issue bonds, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alabama Road and Bridge Rehabilitation and Improvement Authority established to finance road and bridge improvements, authority to issue bonds, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateEngrossed
2018-03-22SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1106
2018-03-22SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-02-06SenateSanford motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2018-02-06SenateDial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 313
2018-02-06SenateDial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 312
2018-02-06SenateTransportation and Energy Amendment Offered
2018-02-06SenateTransportation and Energy Amendment Offered
2018-02-06SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2018-01-18SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
2018-01-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB86&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB86-int.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/189948-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/189831-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=586129&VOTE=312&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=586133&VOTE=313&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=600422&VOTE=1106&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback