AL SB86 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Assigned Act No. 2017-82.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Assigned Act No. 2017-82.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Use tax, simplified sellers, procedures for collection and distribution of proceeds from out-of-state sellers, six month deferral deleted, disclosures re eligible sellers, reporting, Sec. 40-23-197.1 added; Secs. 40-2-11, 40-23-191, 40-23-193, 40-23-195 am'd.
Title
Use tax, simplified sellers, procedures for collection and distribution of proceeds from out-of-state sellers, six month deferral deleted, disclosures re eligible sellers, reporting, Sec. 40-23-197.1 added; Secs. 40-2-11, 40-23-191, 40-23-193, 40-23-195 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2017-82. |
2017-03-15 | House | Signature Requested |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2017-03-14 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 278 |
2017-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 61 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |