AL SB86 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Assigned Act No. 2014-295.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Assigned Act No. 2014-295.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicle license tags, renewals, additional time for deployed military, Sec. 32-6-65 am'd.
Title
Motor vehicle license tags, renewals, additional time for deployed military, Sec. 32-6-65 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-295. |
2014-04-01 | House | Signature Requested |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2014-04-01 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1016 |
2014-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-12 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-30 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Military and Veterans Affairs |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 198 |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |