AL SB85 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - Assigned Act No. 2017-66.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - Assigned Act No. 2017-66.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medicaid fraud, crime of further provided for, penalty, made Class C felony, statutes of limitations revised for certain fraudulent activity, Sec. 22-1-11 am'd.
Title
Medicaid fraud, crime of further provided for, penalty, made Class C felony, statutes of limitations revised for certain fraudulent activity, Sec. 22-1-11 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2017-66. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-03-07 | House | Signature Requested |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2017-03-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 160 |
2017-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 27 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |