AL SB84 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-20 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-20 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Filing fees, not required for certain qualified domestic relations orders
Title
Filing fees, not required for certain qualified domestic relations orders
Sponsors
Sen. Lance Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 1177 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - House - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - House - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-20 | Senate | Enacted |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Enacted |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2024-05-09 | House | Signature Requested |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2024-05-08 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1177 |
2024-05-08 | House | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-02-28 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-28 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-02-15 | House | Pending House Ways and Means General Fund |
2024-02-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 45 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Pending Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |