AL SB84 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Traffic stops, racial profiling by law enforcement officers, prohibited, written policies, forms for statistics, and reports to Attorney General required, provision for complaints
Title
Traffic stops, racial profiling by law enforcement officers, prohibited, written policies, forms for statistics, and reports to Attorney General required, provision for complaints
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Stutts motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Stutts motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Judiciary |
2018-03-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Engrossed |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 37 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 36 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Stutts motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 35 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Pittman Amendment Offered |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Stutts Amendment Offered |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 34 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |