AL SB84 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - Assigned Act No. 2014-165.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Habitual Offender Act, retroactive application of law after 2000 amendment, provision repealed, Sec. 13A-5-9.1 repealed

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Habitual Offender Act, retroactive application of law after 2000 amendment, provision repealed, Sec. 13A-5-9.1 repealed

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-06SenateAssigned Act No. 2014-165.
2014-03-06SenateEnrolled
2014-03-06HouseSignature Requested
2014-03-06SenatePassed Second House
2014-03-06HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 638
2014-03-06HouseThird Reading Passed
2014-02-20HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-02-11HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
2014-02-06SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 294
2014-02-06SenateThird Reading Passed
2014-01-23SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-01-14SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback