AL SB84 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-25 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
Pending: House Ways and Means Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-25 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
Pending: House Ways and Means Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans, family educational benefits, limited to tuition only for family members granted benefits for the first time after August 1, 2012, Secs. 31-6-2, 31-6-4, 31-6-5, 31-6-6, 31-6-15 am'd.
Title
Veterans, family educational benefits, limited to tuition only for family members granted benefits for the first time after August 1, 2012, Secs. 31-6-2, 31-6-4, 31-6-5, 31-6-6, 31-6-15 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Motion to Miscellaneous (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Motion to Miscellaneous (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 604 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 603 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Motion to Miscellaneous adopted Roll Call 602 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Pittman Amendment Offered |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Pittman motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |