AL SB84 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Forwarded to Governor on May 24, 2011 at 6:35 p.m. on May 24, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Forwarded to Governor on May 24, 2011 at 6:35 p.m. on May 24, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Property owners, liability limited for leasing property for hunting or fishing, Landowners Protection Act
Title
Property owners, liability limited for leasing property for hunting or fishing, Landowners Protection Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-24 | Forwarded to Governor on May 24, 2011 at 6:35 p.m. on May 24, 2011 | |
2011-05-24 | Assigned Act No. 2011-293. | |
2011-05-24 | Enrolled | |
2011-05-24 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 815 | |
2011-05-24 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-27 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-21 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry | |
2011-05-24 | Passed Second House | |
2011-05-24 | Warren intended to vote "Yea" | |
2011-04-21 | Engrossed | |
2011-05-24 | Signature Requested | |
2011-04-19 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 329 | |
2011-04-19 | Motion to Table adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-04-19 | Allen Amendment Offered | |
2011-04-19 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 328 | |
2011-04-19 | Judiciary Amendment Offered | |
2011-04-19 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-24 | Reported from Judiciary as Favorable with 1 amendment | |
2011-03-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |