AL SB84 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Agriculture and Forestry
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Agriculture and Forestry
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pesticides and pesticide devices, registration biennially, new fee schedule, Sec. 2-27-9 am'd.
Title
Pesticides and pesticide devices, registration biennially, new fee schedule, Sec. 2-27-9 am'd.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Agriculture and Forestry | |
2010-04-14 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-04-08 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry | |
2010-04-08 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 905 | |
2010-04-08 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-02 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-01-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry |