AL SB82 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Assigned Act No. 2016-313.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Assigned Act No. 2016-313.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Social Work Examiners, State Board of, definition of practice, licensure classification of "graduate social worker" and "certified social worker" changed to "master social worker" and "independent clinical social worker", Secs. 34-30-1, 34-30-3, 34-30-5, 34-30-20, 34-30-22, 34-30-24, 34-30-30, 34-30-31, 34-30-33 am'd.
Title
Social Work Examiners, State Board of, definition of practice, licensure classification of "graduate social worker" and "certified social worker" changed to "master social worker" and "independent clinical social worker", Secs. 34-30-1, 34-30-3, 34-30-5, 34-30-20, 34-30-22, 34-30-24, 34-30-30, 34-30-31, 34-30-33 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Dial [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2016-313. |
2016-05-03 | House | Signature Requested |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2016-04-28 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 808 |
2016-04-28 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-03-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-03-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 369 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Dial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 368 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Health and Human Services Amendment Offered |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services |