AL SB81 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Assigned Act No. 2016-312.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Public contracts, governmental entities precluded from entering into contracts with entities that boycott certain persons or entities with whom this state enjoys open trade

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public contracts, governmental entities precluded from entering into contracts with entities that boycott certain persons or entities with whom this state enjoys open trade

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 84 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-03SenateAssigned Act No. 2016-312.
2016-05-03HouseSignature Requested
2016-05-03SenateEnrolled
2016-05-03SenatePassed Second House
2016-04-28HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 802
2016-04-28HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-04-13HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-04-07HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
2016-04-07SenateEngrossed
2016-04-07SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 547
2016-04-07SenateOrr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 546
2016-04-07SenateOrr Amendment Offered
2016-04-07SenateOrr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 545
2016-04-07SenateJudiciary Amendment Offered
2016-04-07SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-03-03SenateWilliams motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2016-03-03SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2016-02-11SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2016-02-02SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback