AL SB80 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Assigned Act No. 2021-114.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Assigned Act No. 2021-114.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Military installations, land use planning, counties and municipalities to give notice re tall structures and wind energy facilities, Sec. 11-106-6 added; Secs. 11-106-3, 11-106-4 am'd.
Title
Military installations, land use planning, counties and municipalities to give notice re tall structures and wind energy facilities, Sec. 11-106-6 added; Secs. 11-106-3, 11-106-4 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Butler [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - Senate - Reed motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 481 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 275 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 274 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - HBIR: Howard motion to Adopt Roll Call 273 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 58 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - SBIR: Butler motion to Adopt Roll Call 57 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 275 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 274 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - HBIR: Howard motion to Adopt Roll Call 273 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 58 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - SBIR: Butler motion to Adopt Roll Call 57 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2021-114. |
2021-03-11 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-03-09 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Reed motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 481 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2021-03-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 275 |
2021-03-04 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 274 |
2021-03-04 | House | Military and Veterans Affairs Amendment Offered |
2021-03-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-25 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2021-02-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Military and Veterans Affairs |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 58 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 106 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 106 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 106 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |