AL SB80 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 417
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 417
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Colleges and universities, prohibit from requiring resident of state who lives within 75 miles of campus to live on campus
Title
Colleges and universities, prohibit from requiring resident of state who lives within 75 miles of campus to live on campus
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 14 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Bussman motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Bussman motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 417 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Lost in house of origin |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Bussman motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Bussman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 325 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Bussman motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Education and Youth Affairs Amendment Offered |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Marsh motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Education and Youth Affairs as Favorable with 1 amendment |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs |