AL SB8 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - Pending third reading on day 15 Favorable from State Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Treasures and artifacts, cultural resources that are eligible for or listed in National Register of Historic Places, not Al. Register of Landmarks and Heritage, Sec. 41-9-291 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Treasures and artifacts, cultural resources that are eligible for or listed in National Register of Historic Places, not Al. Register of Landmarks and Heritage, Sec. 41-9-291 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-22HousePending third reading on day 15 Favorable from State Government
2018-02-22HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-25HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
2018-01-25SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 146
2018-01-25SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-01-16SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback