AL SB76 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Assigned Act No. 2018-232.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Income tax, individuals, standard deduction increased based on certain adjusted gross income for, Sec. 40-18-15 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax, individuals, standard deduction increased based on certain adjusted gross income for, Sec. 40-18-15 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Holtzclaw motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateAssigned Act No. 2018-232.
2018-03-08HouseSignature Requested
2018-03-08SenateEnrolled
2018-03-08SenatePassed Second House
2018-03-08HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 644
2018-03-08HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-02-22HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-30HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
2018-01-30SenateEngrossed
2018-01-25SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 126
2018-01-25SenateHoltzclaw motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 125
2018-01-25SenateHoltzclaw Amendment Offered
2018-01-25SenateHoltzclaw motion to Reconsider adopted Voice Vote
2018-01-25SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 124
2018-01-25SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-01-23SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB76&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB76-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB76-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB76-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/190284-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=583470&VOTE=124&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=583483&VOTE=125&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=583484&VOTE=126&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=593826&VOTE=644&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=586151&VOTE=203&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=599973&VOTE=1034&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback