AL SB76 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Assigned Act No. 2015-435.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Assigned Act No. 2015-435.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Finance Department, Divisions of Facilities, Leasing, Construction and Energy Management created, duties, certain duties of state Building Commission transferred to, Secs. 41-4-2, 41-4-3, 41-4-261, 41-9-141 am'd; Secs. 41-4-183, 41-6A-4(10), 41-9-140, 41-9-142 repealed
Title
Finance Department, Divisions of Facilities, Leasing, Construction and Energy Management created, duties, certain duties of state Building Commission transferred to, Secs. 41-4-2, 41-4-3, 41-4-261, 41-9-141 am'd; Secs. 41-4-183, 41-6A-4(10), 41-9-140, 41-9-142 repealed
Sponsors
Sen. Del Marsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-04 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 92 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt Williams Substitute (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - Marsh motion to Table Williams Substitute (Y: 15 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-04-16 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 92 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt Williams Substitute (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - Marsh motion to Table Williams Substitute (Y: 15 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-04-16 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2015-435. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-06-04 | House | Signature Requested |
2015-06-04 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1423 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2015-06-03 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1256 |
2015-06-03 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1255 |
2015-06-03 | House | Hill (M) Amendment Offered |
2015-06-03 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1254 |
2015-06-03 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1253 |
2015-06-03 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1252 |
2015-06-03 | House | State Government Amendment #3 Offered |
2015-06-03 | House | State Government Amendment #2 Offered |
2015-06-03 | House | State Government Amendment #1 Offered |
2015-06-03 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-07 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 3 amendments |
2015-05-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Engrossed |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 704 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Marsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 703 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Marsh Amendment Offered |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Marsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 702 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Marsh first Substitute Offered |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Marsh motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Williams motion to Adopt Williams Substitute adopted Roll Call 559 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Marsh motion to Table Williams Substitute Lost Roll Call 558 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Williams first Substitute Offered |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Marsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 557 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Marsh Amendment Offered |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Governmental Affairs first Amendment Offered |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Blackwell motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Marsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 173 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Marsh Amendment Offered |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Marsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 172 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Marsh Amendment Offered |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Marsh motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Reported from Governmental Affairs as Favorable with 1 amendment |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |