AL SB75 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Assigned Act No. 2017-386.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Southern Research Institute, exempt from state, county, and municipal, sales and use taxes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Southern Research Institute, exempt from state, county, and municipal, sales and use taxes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - House - Carns motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - Carns motion to Accede (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Whatley motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19SenateAssigned Act No. 2017-386.
2017-05-19SenateForwarded to Governor on May 19, 2017 at 1:45 p.m. on May 19, 2017
2017-05-19SenateEnrolled
2017-05-19HouseSignature Requested
2017-05-19SenateConcurred in Conference Report
2017-05-19HouseCarns motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1019
2017-05-19HouseConference Report Concurrence Requested
2017-05-17SenateSmitherman motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1249
2017-05-17SenateConference Report
2017-05-17SenateConference Committee Appointed
2017-05-17HouseCarns motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 929 House appoints Carns, Garrett and McClammy
2017-05-17HouseConference Committee Requested
2017-05-17SenateWhatley motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 1141 P&PO appoints Waggoner, Smitherman and Orr
2017-05-17SenateConcurrence Requested
2017-05-16HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 896
2017-05-16HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 895
2017-05-16HouseWays and Means Education Amendment Offered
2017-05-16HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-05-09HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2017-04-06HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
2017-04-06SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 474
2017-04-06SenateSmitherman motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2017-04-06SenateFinance and Taxation Education Amendment Offered
2017-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-03-09SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2017-02-07SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB75&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/SB75-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=567096&VOTE=474&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=576668&VOTE=895&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=576669&VOTE=896&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=577311&VOTE=1141&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=577718&VOTE=929&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=577976&VOTE=1249&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=578888&VOTE=1019&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback