AL SB74 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-20 - Concurrence Requested
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-20 - Concurrence Requested
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Pilotage Commission, State, Sunset Law Review, continued until October 1, 2020.
Title
Pilotage Commission, State, Sunset Law Review, continued until October 1, 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2018-02-20 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 394 |
2018-02-20 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 393 |
2018-02-20 | House | Boards, Agencies and Commissions Amendment Offered |
2018-02-20 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-08 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2018-01-30 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Engrossed |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Pittman motion to Reconsider and Table adopted Voice Vote |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 180 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 181 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Pittman Amendment Offered |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Pittman motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |