AL SB73 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Assigned Act No. 2019-457.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Assigned Act No. 2019-457.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Pharmacy benefit managers, prohibited from restricting pharmacies and pharmacists from disclosing costs information to patients on alternative drugs or other services and costs, enforcement by Insurance Commissioner, audits further regulated including penalties and assessments against pharmacist, Secs. 34-23-184, 34-23-185, 34-23-186 am'd.
Title
Pharmacy benefit managers, prohibited from restricting pharmacies and pharmacists from disclosing costs information to patients on alternative drugs or other services and costs, enforcement by Insurance Commissioner, audits further regulated including penalties and assessments against pharmacist, Secs. 34-23-184, 34-23-185, 34-23-186 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-457. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor at 11:23 a.m. on May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-30 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2019-05-29 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1143 |
2019-05-29 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-22 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 773 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 772 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Orr Amendment Offered |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 771 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Orr Amendment Offered |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 770 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Healthcare Amendment Offered |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 769 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Healthcare first Substitute Offered |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Healthcare |