AL SB73 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Assigned Act No. 2014-294.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Assigned Act No. 2014-294.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Real estate appraisers, licensure, consideration of applicant's criminal conviction, Sec. 34-27A-7 am'd.
Title
Real estate appraisers, licensure, consideration of applicant's criminal conviction, Sec. 34-27A-7 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Brewbaker motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Brewbaker motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-294. |
2014-04-01 | House | Signature Requested |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2014-04-01 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1014 |
2014-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-12 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Engrossed |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 143 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Brewbaker motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 142 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |