AL SB72 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Energy, Alabama Public Interest Energy and Fuel Research and Development Grants Program, established, funding for energy and fuel projects, Advisory Commission on Public Interest Energy and Fuel Research and Development Grants, established, Public Interest Energy and Fuel Research and Development Grants Fund, established, Agriculture and Industries Department Center for Alternative Fuels to administer, appropriation
Title
Energy, Alabama Public Interest Energy and Fuel Research and Development Grants Program, established, funding for energy and fuel projects, Advisory Commission on Public Interest Energy and Fuel Research and Development Grants, established, Public Interest Energy and Fuel Research and Development Grants Fund, established, Agriculture and Industries Department Center for Alternative Fuels to administer, appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Indefinitely Postponed | |
2012-05-02 | Ward motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-05-02 | Energy and Natural Resources Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-02 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2012-02-21 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Energy and Natural Resources |