AL SB71 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Assigned Act No. 2015-434.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Assigned Act No. 2015-434.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Accountability Act of 2013, revised to clarify intent of educational choice, define academic year, define family, further provide for tax credits, limits amount of administrative and operating expenses paid from revenue, annual reporting to Department of Revenue, Secs. 16-6D-4, 16-6D-9 am'd.
Title
Accountability Act of 2013, revised to clarify intent of educational choice, define academic year, define family, further provide for tax credits, limits amount of administrative and operating expenses paid from revenue, annual reporting to Department of Revenue, Secs. 16-6D-4, 16-6D-9 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Del Marsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - House - Johnson (K) motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 84 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - House - Johnson (K) motion to Accede (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 68 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - House - Johnson (K) motion to Table (Y: 52 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - House - Johnson (K) motion to Accede (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 68 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - House - Johnson (K) motion to Table (Y: 52 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2015-434. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Conference Committee on SB71 2015RS first Substitute Offered |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-06-04 | House | Signature Requested |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Concurred in Conference Report |
2015-06-03 | House | Johnson (K) motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1243 |
2015-06-03 | House | Conference Report Concurrence Requested |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1325 |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Conference Report |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2015-05-28 | House | Johnson (K) motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 1164 House appoints Johnson (K), Pringle and Hall |
2015-05-28 | House | Conference Committee Requested |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 1278 P&PO appoints Marsh, Pittman and Ross |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2015-05-28 | House | Daniels intended to vote "Nay" |
2015-05-28 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1140 |
2015-05-28 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1139 |
2015-05-28 | House | Hall Amendment Offered |
2015-05-28 | House | Johnson (K) motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1138 |
2015-05-28 | House | Baker Amendment Offered |
2015-05-28 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1137 |
2015-05-28 | House | Ways and Means Education Amendment #2 Offered |
2015-05-28 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1136 |
2015-05-28 | House | Ways and Means Education Amendment #1 Offered |
2015-05-28 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments |
2015-03-31 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Engrossed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 261 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Motion to Adopt Marsh Substitute as Amended adopted Roll Call 260 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Motion to Adopt Reed Amdt to Marsh Sub adopted Roll Call 259 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 258 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reed Amendment Offered |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Marsh first Substitute Offered |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Marsh motion to Table Committee Substitute adopted Voice Vote |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Education and Youth Affairs Substitute Offered |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Marsh motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education first Substitute Offered |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |