AL SB71 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Forwarded to Executive Department
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Municipal annexations, validated and ratified under certain conditions, Sec. 11-42-5 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipal annexations, validated and ratified under certain conditions, Sec. 11-42-5 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-28 Forwarded to Executive Department
2011-04-28 Assigned Act No. 2011-214.
2011-04-28 Signature Requested
2011-04-28 Enrolled
2011-04-28 Passed Second House
2011-04-28 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 556
2011-03-24 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 77
2011-04-28 Third Reading Passed
2011-03-31 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2011-03-24 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 76
2011-03-24 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government
2011-03-24 Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered
2011-03-24 Third Reading Passed
2011-03-24 Engrossed
2011-03-08 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2011-03-01 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB71
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/SB71-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/SB71-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/SB71-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=398754&VOTE=76&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=398755&VOTE=77&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=408637&VOTE=556&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback