AL SB71 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Cemeteries and graveyards, desecration or defacement of property, types of property included in offense expanded, exemptions for cemetery operators, Sec. 13A-7-23.1 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cemeteries and graveyards, desecration or defacement of property, types of property included in offense expanded, exemptions for cemetery operators, Sec. 13A-7-23.1 am'd.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-22 Enrolled
2010-04-22 Delivered to Governor at 2:01 p.m. on April 22, 2010
2010-04-22 Assigned Act No. 2010-723 on 04/30/2010.
2010-04-22 Enrolled
2010-04-22 Signature Requested
2010-04-22 Concurred in Second House Amendment
2010-04-22 Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1184
2010-04-22 Concurrence Requested
2010-04-21 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1106
2010-04-21 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1105
2010-04-21 Johnson Amendment Offered
2010-02-17 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 267
2010-04-21 Third Reading Passed
2010-02-17 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 266
2010-04-01 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2010-02-18 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
2010-02-17 Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered
2010-02-18 Engrossed
2010-02-17 Third Reading Passed
2010-01-14 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2010-01-12 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback