AL SB7 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Terrorism, forfeiture of property derived from, authorization of claims by injured parties and law enforcement, allocation of proceeds from forfeiture, civil action for damages, limitations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Terrorism, forfeiture of property derived from, authorization of claims by injured parties and law enforcement, allocation of proceeds from forfeiture, civil action for damages, limitations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Sanders motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Allen motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Allen motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-01HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
2018-02-01SenateEngrossed
2018-01-30SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 212
2018-01-30SenateSanders motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 211
2018-01-30SenateSanders Amendment Offered
2018-01-30SenateAllen motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 210
2018-01-30SenateAllen Amendment Offered
2018-01-30SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-01-25SenateAllen motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2018-01-25SenateAllen Amendment Offered
2018-01-25SenateAllen motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 156
2018-01-25SenateJudiciary Amendment Offered
2018-01-25SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2018-01-18SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2018-01-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB7&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB7-int.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/189365-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=583680&VOTE=156&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=584452&VOTE=210&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=584454&VOTE=211&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=584460&VOTE=212&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback