AL SB69 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Children First Trust Fund, appropriations from for fiscal year ending September 30, 2025, use of allocation pursuant to Section 41-15B-2.2 and this act, tobacco settlement revenues deposited in fund within 30 days of receipt.
Title
Children First Trust Fund, appropriations from for fiscal year ending September 30, 2025, use of allocation pursuant to Section 41-15B-2.2 and this act, tobacco settlement revenues deposited in fund within 30 days of receipt.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 1077 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - House - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 475 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - House - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 475 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Senate | Enacted |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Enacted |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-05-02 | House | Signature Requested |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2024-05-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 1077 |
2024-05-02 | House | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-04-30 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-30 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-11 | House | Pending House Ways and Means General Fund |
2024-04-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 475 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Pending Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |