AL SB69 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Assigned Act No. 2019-340.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Marriage license, recording by judge of probate, transmission to Vital Statistics office, Secs. 30-1-9, 30-1-10, 30-1-11, 30-1-13, 30-1-14 repealed; Secs. 22-9A-17, 30-1-5, 30-1-12, 30-1-16 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marriage license, recording by judge of probate, transmission to Vital Statistics office, Secs. 30-1-9, 30-1-10, 30-1-11, 30-1-13, 30-1-14 repealed; Secs. 22-9A-17, 30-1-5, 30-1-12, 30-1-16 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 67 N: 26 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28SenateAssigned Act No. 2019-340.
2019-05-28SenateEnrolled
2019-05-28HouseSignature Requested
2019-05-28SenatePassed Second House
2019-05-23HouseJones (M), Hurst and Hatcher intended to vote "Nay"
2019-05-23HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 952
2019-05-23HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-04-11HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-03-21HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
2019-03-21SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 29
2019-03-21SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-03-20SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-03-05SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback