AL SB69 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Assigned Act No. 2018-70.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Assigned Act No. 2018-70.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Home Medical Equipment, Board of, Sunset Law review, continued until October 1, 2022.
Title
Home Medical Equipment, Board of, Sunset Law review, continued until October 1, 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2018-70. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-01 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2018-02-01 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 162 |
2018-02-01 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-25 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 16 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |