AL SB68 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Assigned Act No. 2021-202.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Assigned Act No. 2021-202.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Courts, probate courts, general jurisdiction over orphans' business deleted, const. amend.
Title
Courts, probate courts, general jurisdiction over orphans' business deleted, const. amend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 861 (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - HBIR: Wadsworth motion to Adopt Roll Call 860 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 171 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - SBIR: Barfoot motion to Adopt Roll Call 170 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - HBIR: Wadsworth motion to Adopt Roll Call 860 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 171 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - SBIR: Barfoot motion to Adopt Roll Call 170 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2021-202. |
2021-04-15 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2021-04-15 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 861 |
2021-04-15 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-24 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 171 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB204 (Same As) 2021-05-06 - Indefinitely Postponed
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | 37A | 51.190 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 37A | 51.192 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 37A | 51.196 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 37A | 51.220 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 37A | 51.221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 37A | 51.222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 37A | 51.225 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 37A | 51.228 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 37A | 51.232 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 37A | 51.244 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 37A | 51.302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 37A | 51.305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 37A | 51.306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 37A | 51.307 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 37A | 51.308 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |