AL SB68 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Courts, private judges requirements to serve, former appellate judges eligible to serve, Attorney General, defense of cases brought against private judge, Secs. 12-11A-2, 12-11A-4, 12-11A-7, 12-11A-8 am'd.; Act 2012-266, 2012 Reg. Sess., am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Courts, private judges requirements to serve, former appellate judges eligible to serve, Attorney General, defense of cases brought against private judge, Secs. 12-11A-2, 12-11A-4, 12-11A-7, 12-11A-8 am'd.; Act 2012-266, 2012 Reg. Sess., am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-01HousePending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Judiciary
2014-04-01HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-03-20HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
2014-03-20SenateEngrossed
2014-03-20SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1003
2014-03-20SenateWard motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1002
2014-03-20SenateJudiciary Amendment Offered
2014-03-20SenateThird Reading Passed
2014-01-23SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2014-01-14SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback