AL SB67 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-03 - Assigned Act No. 2022-122.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-03 - Assigned Act No. 2022-122.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Aid Highway Finance Authority, date for payment of principal and interest, further provided, Sec. 23-1-314 am'd.
Title
Federal Aid Highway Finance Authority, date for payment of principal and interest, further provided, Sec. 23-1-314 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 474 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - HBIR: South motion to Adopt Roll Call 473 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 314 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - SBIR: Allen motion to Adopt Roll Call 313 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - HBIR: South motion to Adopt Roll Call 473 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 314 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - SBIR: Allen motion to Adopt Roll Call 313 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2022-122. |
2022-03-03 | House | Signature Requested |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2022-03-03 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 474 |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 314 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
HB107 (Same As) 2022-02-17 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy