AL SB67 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-08 - Finance and Taxation Education first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-08 - Finance and Taxation Education first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Pharmaceutical Services Providers, supplemental privilege tax, authorized to petition Dept. of Revenue for direct refund of certain overpayments, Sec. 40-26B-9 am'd.
Title
Pharmaceutical Services Providers, supplemental privilege tax, authorized to petition Dept. of Revenue for direct refund of certain overpayments, Sec. 40-26B-9 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Bussman motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Bussman motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education first Amendment Offered |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2018-95. |
2018-02-08 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2018-02-06 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 201 |
2018-02-06 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-01 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-25 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Engrossed |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 144 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Bussman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 143 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |