AL SB66 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Assigned Act No. 2019-103.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Hunting, authorize the taking of whitetail deer or feral swine by means of bait, when baiting privilege license is purchased, under certain conditions, Sec. 9-11-244 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hunting, authorize the taking of whitetail deer or feral swine by means of bait, when baiting privilege license is purchased, under certain conditions, Sec. 9-11-244 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 83 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Adopt (Y: 12 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateAssigned Act No. 2019-103.
2019-04-30HouseSignature Requested
2019-04-30SenateEnrolled
2019-04-25SenatePassed Second House
2019-04-25HouseWingo intended to vote "Nay"
2019-04-25HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 381
2019-04-25HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-04-18HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-04-04HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry
2019-04-04SenateEngrossed
2019-04-04SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 160
2019-04-04SenateChambliss motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 159
2019-04-04SenateChambliss Amendment Offered
2019-04-04SenateWilliams motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 158
2019-04-04SenateAgriculture, Conservation and Forestry Amendment Offered
2019-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-03-20SenateWilliams motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2019-03-20SenateAgriculture, Conservation and Forestry Amendment Offered
2019-03-20SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2019-03-19SenateActed on by Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry as Favorable with 1 amendment
2019-03-05SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB66&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/SB66-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/SB66-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/SB66-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/197990-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/198684-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=608313&VOTE=158&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=608315&VOTE=159&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=608316&VOTE=160&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=613290&VOTE=381&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback