AL SB66 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-20 - Assigned Act No. 2014-71.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-20 - Assigned Act No. 2014-71.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ethics Commission, statements of economic interest, electronic database, redaction of identifying information to include statements filed prior to August 1, 2013, Sec. 36-25-4.3 am'd.
Title
Ethics Commission, statements of economic interest, electronic database, redaction of identifying information to include statements filed prior to August 1, 2013, Sec. 36-25-4.3 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-20 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-71. |
2014-02-20 | House | Signature Requested |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2014-02-18 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 336 |
2014-02-18 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ethics and Campaign Finance |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 134 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Reported from Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections as Favorable |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections |