AL SB63 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Assigned Act No. 2014-438.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Human Resources Department, public assistance, drug testing for applicants and recipients required upon reasonable suspicion, ineligibility under certain conditions, department to implement, rulemaking authority

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human Resources Department, public assistance, drug testing for applicants and recipients required upon reasonable suspicion, ineligibility under certain conditions, department to implement, rulemaking authority

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 73 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - Hammon motion to Previous Question (Y: 63 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - Rich motion to Table (Y: 62 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Marsh table Marsh motion to reconsider (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-03SenateAssigned Act No. 2014-438.
2014-04-03SenateEnrolled
2014-04-03HouseSignature Requested
2014-04-03SenatePassed Second House
2014-04-03HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1109
2014-04-03HouseHammon motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 1108
2014-04-03HouseRich motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1107
2014-04-03HouseGrimsley Amendment Offered
2014-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed
2014-03-13HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-02-26HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
2014-02-26SenateEngrossed
2014-02-26SenateMarsh table Marsh motion to reconsider adopted Roll Call 523
2014-02-26SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 522
2014-02-26SenateSingleton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 521
2014-02-26SenateSingleton Amendment Offered
2014-02-26SenatePittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 520
2014-02-26SenateFiscal Responsibility and Accountability Amendment Offered
2014-02-26SenateThird Reading Passed
2014-02-25SenatePlaced on the Calendar as Unfinished Business
2014-02-25SenateMotion to Carry Over as Unfinished Business adopted Voice Vote
2014-01-22SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2014-01-14SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB63
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/SB63-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/SB63-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/SB63-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=489031&VOTE=520&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=489049&VOTE=521&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=489065&VOTE=522&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=489066&VOTE=523&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=500704&VOTE=1107&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=500705&VOTE=1108&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=500710&VOTE=1109&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback