AL SB63 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Delivered to Governor at 11:15 a.m. on April 5, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Delivered to Governor at 11:15 a.m. on April 5, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Corrections Department, prison industries, sale of products further provided for, operation of joint venture with private businesses, authorized, Secs. 14-7-7, 14-7-22 am'd.
Title
Corrections Department, prison industries, sale of products further provided for, operation of joint venture with private businesses, authorized, Secs. 14-7-7, 14-7-22 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 73 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Delivered to Governor at 11:15 a.m. on April 5, 2012 | |
2012-04-05 | Assigned Act No. 2012-194. | |
2012-04-05 | Signature Requested | |
2012-04-05 | Enrolled | |
2012-04-05 | Passed Second House | |
2012-04-03 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 565 | |
2012-04-03 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-01 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-16 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government | |
2012-02-16 | Engrossed | |
2012-02-14 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 56 | |
2012-02-14 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 55 | |
2012-02-14 | Singleton Amendment Offered | |
2012-02-14 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-08 | Reported from Finance and Taxation General Fund as Favorable | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |