AL SB62 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Assigned Act No. 2019-99.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Assigned Act No. 2019-99.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Roofing contracts, cancellation further provided after notice of insurance coverage, Sec. 8-36-2 am'd.
Title
Roofing contracts, cancellation further provided after notice of insurance coverage, Sec. 8-36-2 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-99. |
2019-04-25 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2019-04-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 339 |
2019-04-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-21 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 44 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance |