AL SB62 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Assigned Act No. 2017-151 on 04/18/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Assigned Act No. 2017-151 on 04/18/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Shelby Co., county board of education and superintendent of education, elected by electors residing outside of corporate limits of any city with a city board of education, const. amend.
Title
Shelby Co., county board of education and superintendent of education, elected by electors residing outside of corporate limits of any city with a city board of education, const. amend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 51 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
2017-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 25 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 25 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2017-151 on 04/18/2017. |
2017-04-18 | House | Signature Requested |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2017-04-18 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 511 |
2017-04-18 | House | Resolution of Local Application Submitted |
2017-04-18 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 510 |
2017-04-18 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-13 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-28 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Shelby County Legislation |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 143 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Holley motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Holley motion to Reconsider adopted Voice Vote |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 134 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Local Legislation Shelby County |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |