AL SB60 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Pending third reading on day 12 Favorable from Public Safety and Homeland Security
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Pending third reading on day 12 Favorable from Public Safety and Homeland Security
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, reduced speed school zones, to include schools in a municipality, Secs. 32-5A-181, 32-5A-182, 32-5A-183 am'd.
Title
Motor vehicles, reduced speed school zones, to include schools in a municipality, Secs. 32-5A-181, 32-5A-182, 32-5A-183 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Pending third reading on day 12 Favorable from Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2019-04-18 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 192 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 191 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Education Policy Amendment Offered |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy |