AL SB60 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Assigned Act No. 2017-354.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Assigned Act No. 2017-354.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Memorial Preservation Act, monuments 40 years and older on public property prohibited from relocation or removal, monuments 20 to 40 years old required to get permission of Committee on Alabama Monument Protection, members, waivers, fines, exemptions
Title
Memorial Preservation Act, monuments 40 years and older on public property prohibited from relocation or removal, monuments 20 to 40 years old required to get permission of Committee on Alabama Monument Protection, members, waivers, fines, exemptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - Senate - Singleton motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - Knight motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 35 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-05-19 - House - Butler motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 68 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Allen motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Butler motion to Accede (Y: 71 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Allen motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 72 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Ledbetter motion to Previous Question (Y: 69 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 82 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Holmes (A) motion to Carry Over Temporarily (Y: 23 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2017-04-27 - House - Butler motion to Adopt (Y: 73 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Butler motion to Table pending Roll Call 663 (Y: 67 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Allen motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - Knight motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 35 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-05-19 - House - Butler motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 68 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Allen motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Butler motion to Accede (Y: 71 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Allen motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 72 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Ledbetter motion to Previous Question (Y: 69 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 82 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Holmes (A) motion to Carry Over Temporarily (Y: 23 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2017-04-27 - House - Butler motion to Adopt (Y: 73 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Butler motion to Table pending Roll Call 663 (Y: 67 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Allen motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2017-354. |
2017-05-19 | House | Signature Requested |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-05-19 | House | Knight motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1042 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Second House Concurs in Executive Amendment |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Singleton motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1331 |
2017-05-19 | House | House of Origin Concurs in Executive Amendment |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Executive Amendment Offered |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Executive Amendment |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Forwarded to Governor on May 19, 2017 at 1:45 p.m. on May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | House | Signature Requested |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-05-19 | House | Givan and Coleman intended to vote "Nay" and Speaker McCutcheon intended to vote "Yea" |
2017-05-19 | House | Butler motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1013 |
2017-05-19 | House | Motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 1012 |
2017-05-19 | House | Knight substitute motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee pending |
2017-05-19 | House | Conference Report Concurrence Requested |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Concurred in Conference Report |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Allen motion to Concur In and Adopt Conference Report adopted Roll Call 1277 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 1276 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Conference Committee on SB60 2017RS first Substitute Offered |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Offered |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2017-05-11 | House | Butler motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 872 House appoints Butler, Ledbetter and Grimsley |
2017-05-11 | House | Conference Committee Concurrence Requested |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Allen motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 800 P&PO appoints Marsh, Allen and Singleton |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2017-04-27 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 669 |
2017-04-27 | House | Ledbetter motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 668 |
2017-04-27 | House | Bracy intended to vote "Yea" |
2017-04-27 | House | Ingram motion to withdraw his motion to reconsider |
2017-04-27 | House | Ingram motion to reconsider offered |
2017-04-27 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 667 |
2017-04-27 | House | Knight 2nd Amendment Offered |
2017-04-27 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 666 |
2017-04-27 | House | Lindsey Amendment Offered |
2017-04-27 | House | Holmes (A) motion to Carry Over Temporarily lost Roll Call 664 |
2017-04-27 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 665 |
2017-04-27 | House | Standridge Amendment Offered |
2017-04-27 | House | Butler motion to Table adopted Roll Call 663 |
2017-04-27 | House | Knight 1st Amendment Offered |
2017-04-27 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-13 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 283 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Allen motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 282 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Coleman-Madison Amendment Offered |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Marsh motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Coleman-Madison Amendment Offered |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Allen first Substitute Offered |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Allen motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Governmental Affairs first Substitute Offered |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Allen motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |