AL SB581 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 2:45 p.m. on May 16, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Etowah Co., court costs, Legislature authorized to provide by general or local law, prior local laws ratified, const. amend.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Etowah Co., court costs, Legislature authorized to provide by general or local law, prior local laws ratified, const. amend.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 25 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-16 Delivered to Secretary of State at 2:45 p.m. on May 16, 2012
2012-05-16 Assigned Act No. 2012-485.
2012-05-16 Signature Requested
2012-05-16 Enrolled
2012-05-16 Passed Second House
2012-05-16 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1527
2012-05-16 Third Reading Passed
2012-05-10 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-05-09 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
2012-05-09 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1236
2012-05-09 Third Reading Passed
2012-05-08 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-05-02 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback