AL SB58 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
County tax assessing official, tax valuation disputes, authorized to defend state, Sec. 40-3-26 am'd.
Title
County tax assessing official, tax valuation disputes, authorized to defend state, Sec. 40-3-26 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 74 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - SBIR: Chesteen motion to Adopt Roll Call 73 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - SBIR: Chesteen motion to Adopt Roll Call 73 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 74 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB77 (Same As) 2022-03-17 - Forwarded to Governor at 11:20 a.m. on March 17, 2022.