AL SB57 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Assigned Act No. 2014-437.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Schools, diabetes, delegation of specific medical procedures and training of certain school personnel relating to insulin, limited liability of public schools and certain school personnel, Alabama Safe at Schools Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools, diabetes, delegation of specific medical procedures and training of certain school personnel relating to insulin, limited liability of public schools and certain school personnel, Alabama Safe at Schools Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-03SenateAssigned Act No. 2014-437.
2014-04-03SenateEnrolled
2014-04-03HouseSignature Requested
2014-04-03SenatePassed Second House
2014-04-03HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1118
2014-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed
2014-03-20HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-03-18HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
2014-03-18SenateEngrossed
2014-03-18SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 825
2014-03-18SenateWaggoner motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 824
2014-03-18SenateHealth first Substitute Offered
2014-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed
2014-03-13SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2014-01-14SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB57
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/SB57-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/SB57-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/SB57-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=494966&VOTE=824&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=494967&VOTE=825&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=500849&VOTE=1118&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback