AL SB57 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 10:46 a.m. on May 20, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 10:46 a.m. on May 20, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fleet Management Office, established in Transportation Department, statewide fleet management program authorized, personnel and property of Finance Department, Division of Service for the operation and maintenance of transportation pool and state-owned motor vehicles transferred, Secs. 23-1-50.1, 41-17A-6 am'd.; Secs. 41-17-1 to 41-17-9, inclusive, repealed
Title
Fleet Management Office, established in Transportation Department, statewide fleet management program authorized, personnel and property of Finance Department, Division of Service for the operation and maintenance of transportation pool and state-owned motor vehicles transferred, Secs. 23-1-50.1, 41-17A-6 am'd.; Secs. 41-17-1 to 41-17-9, inclusive, repealed
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | Senate | Delivered to Governor at 10:46 a.m. on May 20, 2013 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2013-282. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | House | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2013-05-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1213 |
2013-05-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Engrossed |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 388 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 387 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Ward first Substitute Offered |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Ward motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability Amendment Offered |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability |